Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Pinerolo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1838Born
30 May 186324.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 189455.8AppointedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
27 May 189455.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
19 Aug 192284.1DiedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Rossi (VIAF: 89351288)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Pinerolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCavallermaggiore, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopS. Felipoo Neri, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1923
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jun 2017