Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaetano Quattrocchi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Serra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1850Born
20 Dec 187323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
11 Feb 189645.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
11 Feb 189645.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Europus
16 Feb 189645.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Europus
17 Mar 189645.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
15 Jun 190049.9AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
1 Apr 190352.7ResignedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
1 Apr 190352.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serra
8 Jun 190352.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Quattrocchi
Archbishop Gaetano Quattrocchi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMazarino, Diocese of Piazza Armerina
Ordained BishopCollege Pio Latino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 266, and Page 374
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 514
  • ob: CB, 7 May 2012
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017