Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Flaviano Giacomo Stefano Salustri, O.A.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Peking [Beijing]

Note/Previous Titular See: (Giovanni Damasceno della Concezione)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1727BornRoma
19 Dec 176032.9Ordained PriestPriest of Agostiniani Scalzi
6 Jun 177850.4SelectedBishop of Peking [Beijing], China
20 Jul 177850.5ConfirmedBishop of Peking [Beijing], China
2 Apr 178052.2Ordained BishopBishop of Peking [Beijing], China
24 Sep 178153.7DiedBishop of Peking [Beijing], China

MicroData Summary for Flaviano Giacomo Stefano Salustri:
Bishop Flaviano Giacomo Stefano Salustri O.A.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Peking [Beijing]

  • a priest for 20.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 332
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015