Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arturo Salazar Mejia, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pasto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1921BornSalamina
6 Feb 194422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
14 Oct 196544.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Casanare, Colombia
14 Oct 196544.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Avitta Bibba
9 Jan 196644.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Avitta Bibba
3 Jan 197755.7AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
2 Feb 199573.8RetiredBishop of Pasto, Colombia
1 Nov 200988.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Pasto, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Arturo Salazar Mejia:
Bishop Arturo Salazar Mejia O.A.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pasto

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013