Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre-César d’Anterroches

Deceased

Bishop of Condom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1719BornSaint-Flour
30 Jan 176343.9SelectedBishop of Condom, France
16 May 176344.1ConfirmedBishop of Condom, France
5 Jun 176344.2Ordained BishopBishop of Condom, France
28 Jan 179373.8DiedBishop of Condom, France

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-César d’Anterroches:
Bishop Alexandre-César d’Anterroches (born , died ) Bishop of Condom

  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 178

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Oct 2013