Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Fabri, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fossombrone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1618³BornBologna
14 Jan 169778.2AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
20 Jan 169778.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
17 Apr 170990.5DiedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Fabri:
Bishop Lorenzo Fabri O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Fossombrone

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 204
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015