Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Severine Niwemugizi

Bishop of Rulenge-Ngara, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1956 Born
16 Dec 198428.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rulenge, Tanzania
8 Nov 199640.4AppointedBishop of Rulenge, Tanzania
16 Feb 199740.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rulenge, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Severine Niwemugizi
Bishop Severine Niwemugizi (born ) Bishop of Rulenge-Ngara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKatoke

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rulenge-Ngara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,924

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast