Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jenaro Méndez y del Río

Deceased

Bishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1867BornPajacuarán
15 Mar 189124.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 192356.1AppointedBishop of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México
20 May 192356.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México
8 Jun 192356.4InstalledBishop of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México
17 Mar 193366.1AppointedBishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México
13 Mar 195285.1DiedBishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Jenaro Méndez y del Río:
Bishop Jenaro Méndez y del Río (born , died ) Bishop of Huajuapan de León

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015