Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Mora y del Rio

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1854BornPajacuarán
22 Dec 187925.8Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
19 Jan 189338.9AppointedBishop of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México
19 Mar 189339.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México
23 Nov 190147.7AppointedBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
15 Sep 190753.6AppointedBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
19 Nov 190753.7InstalledBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
2 Dec 190854.8AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
12 Feb 190955.0InstalledArchbishop of México, Federal District
22 Apr 192874.2DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for José Mora y del Rio:
Archbishop José Mora y del Rio (born , died ) Archbishop of México

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 539, and Page 572

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013