Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Boxler

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gualeguaychú


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1920BornSanta Anita
6 Aug 194424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Gualeguaychú, Argentina
25 Apr 196746.7AppointedBishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina
18 Jun 196746.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina
29 Jun 196746.9InstalledBishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina
5 Dec 199676.3RetiredBishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina
1 Jan 199877.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Gualeguaychú, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Pedro Boxler:
Bishop Pedro Boxler (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gualeguaychú

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013