Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis María Blas Maestu Ojanguren, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of San Ramón, Peru

Titular Bishop of Ammoniace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1916Born
7 Jun 194125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
11 Mar 197155.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Ramón, Peru
11 Mar 197155.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ammoniace
2 May 197155.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ammoniace
24 Jan 198366.9DiedVicar Apostolic of San Ramón, Peru

MicroData Summary for Luis María Blas Maestu Ojanguren
Bishop Luis María Blas Maestu Ojanguren O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of San Ramón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEspronceda, Spain

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast