Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valeriano Ludovico Arroyo Paniego, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Requena, Peru

Titular Bishop of Gomphi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1890Born
14 Apr 191726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
26 Jan 195766.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Requena, Peru
26 Jan 195766.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gomphi
28 Apr 195766.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gomphi
26 Nov 197382.9RetiredVicar Apostolic of Requena, Peru
2 Aug 197685.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Requena, Peru

MicroData Summary for Valeriano Ludovico Arroyo Paniego
Bishop Valeriano Ludovico Arroyo Paniego O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Requena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaramillo Quemado, Spain

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast