Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florencio Cerviño y González

Deceased

Bishop of Orense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1857BornSanta Marina de Areas
28 Feb 188527.3Ordained PriestPriest of Tui, Spain
7 Mar 192163.3AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
27 Dec 192164.1Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
12 Jan 192264.2InstalledBishop of Orense, Spain
31 Jan 194183.2DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

MicroData Summary for Florencio Cerviño y González:
Bishop Florencio Cerviño y González (born , died ) Bishop of Orense

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 98
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013