Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentín Reynoso Hidalgo, M.S.C.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic

Titular Bishop of Mades


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1942 Born
8 Sep 197229.7ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
8 Nov 197532.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
22 Oct 200764.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
22 Oct 200764.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mades
8 Dec 200764.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mades
2 Feb 201875.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Valentín Reynoso Hidalgo
Bishop Valentín Reynoso Hidalgo M.S.C. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de los Caballeros

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNagua
Ordained BishopSalón Multiuso, Pontificia Universidad Católica Madre y Maestra, Santiago de los Caballeros, Archdiocese of Santiago de los Caballeros

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de los Caballeros.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,575
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast