Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Rafael Rodríguez Rodríguez, M.S.C.

Bishop of La Vega, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1961 Born
8 Sep 198423.6Perpetual VowsMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
10 Jun 198928.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
23 Feb 201554.1AppointedBishop of La Vega, Dominican Republic
9 May 201554.3Ordained BishopBishop of La Vega, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Héctor Rafael Rodríguez Rodríguez
Bishop Héctor Rafael Rodríguez Rodríguez M.S.C. (born ) Bishop of La Vega

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSánchez

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of La Vega.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2015
  • prof/op: CB, 23 Feb 2015
  • c2: CB, 3 May 2015
  • c34: CB, 9 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,492

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast