Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Klaus Hemmerle

Deceased

Bishop of Aachen, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1929Born
25 May 195223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
9 Sep 197546.4AppointedBishop of Aachen, Germany
8 Nov 197546.5Ordained BishopBishop of Aachen, Germany
23 Jan 199464.8DiedBishop of Aachen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Klaus Hemmerle
Bishop Klaus Hemmerle (born , died ) Bishop of Aachen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFreiburg im Breisgau

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast