Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Marco Prastaro

Bishop-Elect of Asti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1962 Born
22 May 198825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
16 Aug 201855.6AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
21 Oct 201855.8Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Prastaro
Father Marco Prastaro (born ) Bishop-Elect of Asti

EventPlace
Birth PlacePisa, Archdiocese of Pisa
Ordained BishopCathedral, Asti, Diocese of Asti

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Asti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Aug 2018
  • ob: CB, 19 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 22 Aug 2018

Quantcast