Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcellin Randriamamonjy

Bishop of Fenoarivo Atsinanana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1963 BornSandrandahy
30 Aug 199229.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ambositra, Madagascar
10 Feb 200945.8AppointedBishop of Fenoarivo Atsinanana, Madagascar
17 May 200946.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fenoarivo Atsinanana, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Marcellin Randriamamonjy:
Bishop Marcellin Randriamamonjy (born ) Bishop of Fenoarivo Atsinanana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fenoarivo Atsinanana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013