Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Varkey Puthiyakulangara, M.E.P.

Bishop of Port-Bergé


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1953 BornEndoor, India
31 May 198229.3Ordained PriestPriest of Chikmagalur, India
24 Nov 200855.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Port-Bergé, Madagascar
24 May 200956.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Port-Bergé, Madagascar
15 Dec 201360.9SucceededBishop of Port-Bergé, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Georges Varkey Puthiyakulangara:
Bishop Georges Varkey Puthiyakulangara M.E.P. (born ) Bishop of Port-Bergé

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Port-Bergé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,176
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • s: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 15 Dec 2013