Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jose Chirackal

Auxiliary Bishop of Tura, India

Titular Bishop of Acufida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1960 Born
29 Dec 198727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tura, India
24 Feb 202059.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tura, India
24 Feb 202059.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Acufida
4 Jul 202059.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acufida

MicroData Summary for Jose Chirackal
Bishop Jose Chirackal (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarukutty
Ordained BishopSacred Heart Shrine, Chandmari, Diocese of Tura

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tura.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2020
  • ob: CB, 11 Mar 2020
  • ob: CB, 19 Jun 2020
  • c2+: CB, 4 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 4 Jul 2020

Quantcast