Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
31 May 1936 | Born | ||
6 Feb 1968 | 31.6 | Ordained Priest | Priest |
24 Aug 1969 | 33.2 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop |
4 Feb 2007 | 70.6 | Died | Bishop |
(VIAF: 84381101; WikiData: Q11066063)
Bishop
Bedřich
Provazník
(born , died )
Bishop
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Tisovci |
Ordained Priest | Brno, Diocese of Brno, Czechia |
Death Place | Ostrovacice |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠