Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ján Eugen Kočiš

Deceased

Protosyncellus Emeritus of Czech Republic (Ruthenian)

Titular Bishop of Abrittum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1926Born
1 Jan 195124.5Ordained PriestPriest of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovakian), Slovakia
3 Dec 196741.4Ordained BishopBishop
24 Apr 200477.8AppointedProtosyncellus of Czech Republic (Ruthenian)
24 Apr 200477.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abrittum
7 Oct 200680.2RetiredProtosyncellus of Czech Republic (Ruthenian)
4 Dec 201993.4DiedProtosyncellus Emeritus of Czech Republic (Ruthenian)

MicroData Summary for Ján Eugen Kočiš
Bishop Ján Eugen Kočiš (born , died ) Protosyncellus Emeritus of Czech Republic

EventPlace
Birth PlacePozdišovce, Slovakia
Ordained BishopBrno, Diocese of Brno
Death PlacePrešov, Archdiocese of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia

  • a priest for 68.9 years
  • a bishop for 52.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,594
  • c1: CB, 14 Jan 2013
  • r: CB, 16 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2/d: CB, 4 Dec 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast