Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Blaha

Deceased

Bishop of the Titular See


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1938BornBrno, Czech Republic
12 Jul 196729.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 196729.6Ordained BishopBishop
13 Dec 201274.8DiedBishop

MicroData Summary for Jan Blaha:
Bishop Jan Blaha (born , died ) Bishop of Titular See

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,374
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,510
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,064
  • d: CB, 14 Dec 2012
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013