Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Prada Carrera, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1893BornPriaranza del Bierzo, Spain
2 Jun 191723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
3 Sep 194653.1AppointedPrelate of São José de Alto Tocantins, Brazil
3 Sep 194653.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisica
20 Oct 194653.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bisica
17 Jan 195763.5AppointedBishop of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
25 Feb 197682.6RetiredBishop of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
7 Jun 1995101.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Prada Carrera:
Bishop Francisco Prada Carrera C.M.F. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Uruaçu (Uruassu)

  • a priest for 78.0 years
  • a bishop for 48.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013