Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Uruaçu (Uruassu)

Dioecesis Uruassuensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 26 March 1956
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Brasília
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Goias
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 43,000 (16,608 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centro-Oeste
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, C.P. 32, Rua Benedito Almeida Campos 21, 76400-000 Uruacu, GO, Brazil
  • Telephone: (062)3357-1230
  • Fax: 3357-1352

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
26 March 1956ErectedArchdiocese of Goiás Diocese of Uruaçu (Uruassu) (erected)
11 October 1966Territory LostDiocese of Goiás
Diocese of Uruaçu (Uruassu)
Territorial Prelature of Rubiataba (erected)
29 March 1989Territory LostDiocese of Anápolis
Diocese of Ipameri
Diocese of Uruaçu (Uruassu)
Diocese of Luziânia (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966178,667.0%481208127ap1967
1970300,000300,000100.0%4101421,42810268ap1971
1976270,000300,00090.0%2151715,882204613ap1977
1980312,000347,00089.9%3161916,421177020ap1981
1990315,000350,00090.0%7745,0006317ap1991
1999380,000400,00095.0%18102813,5711113818ap2000
2000380,000400,00095.0%21103112,2582123920ap2001
2001380,000400,00095.0%2193012,6662113920ap2002
2002380,000400,00095.0%2493311,5152115720ap2003
2003380,000400,00095.0%2783510,85783823ap2004
2004298,000350,00085.1%298378,05483823ap2005
2010319,000376,00084.8%457526,13472627ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.6, 1 Jan 2012; data: 21 Jan 2012