Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardin-Louis Foucquet

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Embrun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1705BornRennes
17 Sep 174035.6SelectedArchbishop of Embrun, France
5 Dec 174035.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Embrun, France
8 Jan 174136.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Embrun, France
25 May 176762.3ResignedArchbishop of Embrun, France
20 Apr 178580.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Embrun, France

MicroData Summary for Bernardin-Louis Foucquet:
Archbishop Bernardin-Louis Foucquet (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Embrun

  • a bishop for 44.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 203
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Nov 2015