Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ildevert Mathurin Mouanga

Bishop of Kinkala, Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1966 Born
16 Aug 199832.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kinkala, Congo
5 Mar 202053.7AppointedBishop of Kinkala, Congo
28 Jun 202054.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kinkala, Congo

MicroData Summary for Ildevert Mathurin Mouanga
Bishop Ildevert Mathurin Mouanga (born ) Bishop of Kinkala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHamon, Archdiocese of Brazzaville
Ordained BishopStade Omnisport, Kinkala, Diocese of Kinkala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kinkala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2020
  • ob: CB, 9 May 2020
  • ob: CB, 11 Jun 2020
  • c2+: CB, 28 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 29 Jun 2020

Quantcast