Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Joeppen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Germany, Military

Titular Bishop of Cisamus

Note/Previous Titular See: (Prussia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1853Born
10 Aug 187522.4Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
1 Oct 191360.5AppointedBishop of Germany, Military
27 Oct 191360.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cisamus
22 Mar 191461.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cisamus
1 May 192067.1ResignedBishop of Germany, Military
22 Feb 192773.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Germany, Military

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Joeppen (VIAF: 3468891)
Bishop Heinrich Joeppen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Germany, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHüls

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast