Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Esprit-Valentin Fléchier

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1632Born
12 Nov 168553.4SelectedBishop of Lavaur, France
24 Dec 168957.5SelectedBishop of Nîmes, France
21 Jan 169259.6ConfirmedBishop of Nîmes, France
24 Aug 169260.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nîmes, France
16 Feb 171077.6DiedBishop of Nîmes, France

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Esprit-Valentin Fléchier
Bishop Esprit-Valentin Fléchier (born , died ) Bishop of Nîmes

EventPlace
Birth PlacePernes
Ordained BishopVal-de-Grâce, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 284, and Page 406
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,692, Number 30
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 595

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast