Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Alphonse de Valbelle

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Omer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640BornProvence
25 Dec 167737.9SelectedBishop of Alet, France
14 Mar 167838.2ConfirmedBishop of Alet, France
1 Sep 168040.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alet, France
Jun 168444.4ResignedBishop of Alet, France
1 Nov 168949.8SelectedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
9 Nov 169353.8ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
29 Oct 170868.8DiedBishop of Saint-Omer, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Alphonse de Valbelle:
Bishop Louis-Alphonse de Valbelle (died ) Bishop of Saint-Omer

  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 104, and Page 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015