Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Chevalier de Saulx

Deceased

Bishop of Alès (Alais), France


Events

DateEventTitle
Aug 1687SelectedBishop of Alès (Alais), France
17 May 1694ConfirmedBishop of Alès (Alais), France
29 Aug 1694Ordained BishopBishop of Alès (Alais), France
28 Oct 1712DiedBishop of Alès (Alais), France

MicroData Summary for François Chevalier de Saulx
Bishop François Chevalier de Saulx (died ) Bishop of Alès (Alais)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoitou

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 76
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast