Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Laso de la Vega

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Thaumacus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1689³Born
15 Dec 172839.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
13 Mar 172939.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thaumacus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrique Laso de la Vega
Bishop Enrique Laso de la Vega (born ) Titular Bishop of Thaumacus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 372
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 47, Number 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast