Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Aceti (Aoeti)

Deceased

Bishop of Lacedonia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1687Born
19 Jul 171123.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 174456.8AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
13 Sep 174456.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
8 Apr 174961.4DiedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Aceti (Aoeti)
Bishop Tommaso Aceti (Aoeti) (born , died ) Bishop of Lacedonia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFigline Vegliaturo

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 252
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast