Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Piperni

Deceased

Bishop of Caiazzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1707³BornMileto
8 Mar 173224.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 175446.7AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
25 Jul 175446.7Ordained BishopBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
11 Feb 177971.2DiedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Piperni:
Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Piperni (born , died ) Bishop of Caiazzo

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 138
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015