Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermeto José Pinheiro

Deceased

Bishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1870Born
21 Dec 189525.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 191140.7AppointedBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
17 Mar 191241.5Ordained BishopBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
19 May 191241.7InstalledBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
3 Nov 1941³71.1DiedBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hermeto José Pinheiro
Bishop Hermeto José Pinheiro (born , died ) Bishop of Uruguaiana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaldeiros de Traipu

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast