Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Antônio de Oliveira Lopes

Deceased

Archbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1861Born
20 Nov 188625.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 190846.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Fortaleza (Ceará), Brazil
7 Apr 190846.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabae
6 Sep 190846.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabae
26 Nov 191049.1AppointedBishop of Alagôas, Brazil
13 Feb 192058.3AppointedArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
27 Jul 192260.8DiedArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manuel Antônio de Oliveira Lopes
Archbishop Manuel Antônio de Oliveira Lopes (born , died ) Archbishop of Maceió

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Gonçalo dos Campos

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 42
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast