Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz Scortegagna

Deceased

Bishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1881Born
30 Nov 190827.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 193250.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil
18 Mar 193250.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Phocaea
31 Jul 193250.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phocaea
28 Jul 193351.7SucceededBishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil
1 Dec 195170.1DiedBishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz Scortegagna
Bishop Luiz Scortegagna (born , died ) Bishop of Espírito Santo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Vito di Leguzzano

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast