Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Bosquet

Deceased

Bishop of Montpellier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1605BornNarbonne
28 Sep 164843.3AppointedBishop of Lodève, France
20 Dec 164843.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lodève, France
10 Jul 165550.1SelectedBishop of Montpellier, France
31 Jan 165650.6ConfirmedBishop of Montpellier, France
24 Jun 167671.0DiedBishop of Montpellier, France

MicroData Summary for François de Bosquet:
Bishop François de Bosquet (born , died ) Bishop of Montpellier

  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 248, and Page 223
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015