Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Pezzi, F.S.C.B.

Archbishop of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1960 BornRussi, Italy
22 Dec 199030.4Ordained PriestPriest of Fraternitą Sacerdotale dei Missionari di San Carlo Borromeo
21 Sep 200747.1AppointedArchbishop of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow), Russian Federation
27 Oct 200747.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow), Russian Federation

MicroData Summary for Paolo Pezzi:
Archbishop Paolo Pezzi F.S.C.B. (born ) Archbishop of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2007
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,558

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013