Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Trasfigurazione a Novosibirsk

Dioecesis Neosibiriana Transfigurationis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Werth, S.J., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 February 2002
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow)
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Russian Federation
  • Square Kilometers: 2,000,000 (772,500 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: ul. Gorkogo 94, 630099 Novosibirsk, Russia
  • Telephone: (383)218.12.04
  • Fax: 218.11.53

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Administration of Siberia
13 April 1991ErectedApostolic Administration of Kharkiv (suppressed)
Apostolic Administration of Kazan-Samara-Simbirsk (suppressed)
Apostolic Administration of Leningrad (suppressed)
Diocese of Minsk
Archdiocese of Mohilev
Apostolic Administration of Mohilev (suppressed)
Apostolic Administration of Moscow (suppressed)
Apostolic Administration of Kazakhstan (erected) (as Karaganda (Karagandensis Latinorum))
Archdiocese of Minsk-Mohilev (Minsk, Mohilev, and Vitebsk)
Apostolic Administration of Siberia (erected) (as Novosibirsk (Novosibirskensis Latinorum))
18 May 1999Territory LostApostolic Administration of Siberia (Buriat, Hakassia, Jakuzia-Saha, Tuva; Amur, Cita (with Buriato di Aginsloje), Irkutsk (with Buriato di Ust-Orda), Kamchatka, Magadan, Sakhalin; along with Khabarovsk, Krasnojarsk (with "Evemnki" and "Tajmur-DolganaNenec"), Primorje; "Ebrei"; and "Cyukci") Apostolic Administration of Eastern Siberia {Siberia Orientale} (erected)
Apostolic Administration of Western Siberia {Siberia Occidentale}
18 May 1999Name ChangedApostolic Administration of Siberia Apostolic Administration of Western Siberia {Siberia Occidentale}
Diocese of Trasfigurazione a Novosibirsk
11 February 2002ElevatedApostolic Administration of Western Siberia {Siberia Occidentale} Diocese of Trasfigurazione a Novosibirsk

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Apostolic Administration of Western Siberia {Siberia Occidentale}
19991,000,00025,290,0004.0%22224422,72712861178ap2000
20011,000,00025,290,0004.0%44145817,24111876155ap2002
Diocese of Trasfigurazione a Novosibirsk
2002500,00025,290,0002.0%28194710,63812353135ap2003
2003500,00025,290,0002.0%30194910,20422454199ap2004
2004500,00025,290,0002.0%28225010,00022582218ap2005
2010500,00025,000,0002.0%21204112,19522275216ap2011
2014512,00025,600,0002.0%19193813,4731205770ap2015
2017518,00025,910,0002.0%19214012,9501246368ap2018
2020430,74525,980,0001.7%17173412,6681176350ap2021

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Apostolic Administration of Siberia
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 83, Page 544, and Page 545
    • Annuario Pontificio, Year 1992, Page 1,055, and Page 1,128
  • Apostolic Administration of Western Siberia {Siberia Occidentale}
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 91, Page 841
  • Diocese of Trasfigurazione a Novosibirsk
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 94, Page 599, and Page 600

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 7 Aug 2023