Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolai Gennadevich Dubinin, O.F.M. Conv.

Auxiliary Bishop of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow), Russian Federation

Titular Bishop of Aquae in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1973 Born
8 Sep 199522.2Temporary VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
3 Oct 199825.3Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
24 Jun 200027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
30 Jul 202047.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow), Russian Federation
30 Jul 202047.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Byzacena
4 Oct 202047.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Byzacena

MicroData Summary for Nicolai Gennadevich Dubinin
Bishop Nicolai Gennadevich Dubinin O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNovoshakhtinsk
Ordained PriestImmaculate Conception of the Holy Virgin Mary, Cathedral, Moscow, Apostolic Administration of Northern European Russia {Russia Europea Settentrionale}
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception of the Holy Virgin Mary, Cathedral, Moscow, Archdiocese of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jul 2020
  • c1: CB, 30 Jul 2020
  • c34: CB, 4 Sep 2020
  • c34: CB, 2 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast