Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Petre

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Amorium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1692Born
31 Mar 172027.4Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
27 Jul 175057.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
27 Jul 175057.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Amorium
27 Jul 175158.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amorium
5 May 175259.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
24 Dec 177583.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Francis Petre
Bishop Francis Petre (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFidlers, Writtle, Chelmsford, Essex
Ordained PriestTournai, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
Ordained BishopEnglish, College, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Death PlaceShowley Hall, Ribchester, Preston, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Saviour's (Stydd), Church, Ribchester, Preston, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 80, and Page 454
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,413
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,280
  • bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 169
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1751, Number 6
  • c1: CB, 20 Feb 2016
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 21 Jan 2018