Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Maire

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Cinna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1704Born
11 Jun 173026.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Northern District, England, Great Britain
23 Dec 173026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
1 Oct 176763.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
1 Oct 176763.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cinna
29 May 176864.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cinna
25 Jul 176965.5DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Maire
Bishop William Maire (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLartington Hall, Barnard Castle, North Yorkshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Death PlaceLartington Hall, Barnard Castle, North Yorkshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Romald, Church, Romaldkirk, Barnard Castle, North Yorkshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 146
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 165, and Page 454
  • od/op: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • loc: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast