Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Walton

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1716Born
Apr 1739³22.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of London District, England, Great Britain
3 Apr 174124.3Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
18 Jul 177053.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
18 Jul 177053.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
Dec 1770³53.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
24 Dec 177559.0SucceededVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
26 Feb 178063.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Walton (VIAF: 22019450)
Bishop William Walton (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManchester, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Death PlaceCity of York, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Michael's-le-Belfry, Church, City of York, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 200, and Page 454
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 208
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 48
  • od/ob: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • bp: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast