Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Peruzzo, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1878Born
26 Jul 189416.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
13 Jan 190122.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
5 Jan 192445.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mantova, Italy
5 Jan 192445.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
10 Feb 192445.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
19 Oct 192850.2AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
15 Jan 193253.5AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
29 Mar 195273.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
20 Jul 196385.0DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Peruzzo
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Peruzzo C.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMolare

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1962
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Jun 2017