Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gioacchino Di Leo

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1887BornPalermo
10 Jul 191023.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 194052.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
5 Feb 194052.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Memphis
3 Mar 194052.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Memphis
18 Feb 194658.7AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano e Ortona, Italy
5 Jul 195063.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
8 Oct 196376.3DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Di Leo:
Archbishop Gioacchino Di Leo (born , died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013