Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislao Amilcare Battistelli, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Teramo e Atri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1885Born
16 Jun 190721.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
19 Sep 190822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
24 Jun 193246.7AppointedBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
21 Aug 193246.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
30 Oct 193247.0InstalledBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
14 Feb 195266.3AppointedBishop of Teramo e Atri, Italy
16 Feb 196781.3RetiredBishop of Teramo e Atri, Italy
16 Feb 196781.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Amiternum
6 Jan 197690.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Amiternum
20 Feb 198195.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Teramo e Atri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stanislao Amilcare Battistelli (VIAF: 89013849)
Bishop Stanislao Amilcare Battistelli C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Teramo e Atri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFano, Diocese of Fano
Ordained PriestSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSantuario di San Gabriele dell'Addolorata, Basilica, Isola del Gran Sasso, Diocese of Teramo
Death PlaceIsola del Gran Sasso, Diocese of Teramo e Atri

  • a priest for 72.4 years
  • a bishop for 48.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,932, Number 53
  • r: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 59, Page 521
  • i/loc: AM, 4 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast