Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Jacolino

Deceased

Bishop of Trapani, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1895Born
9 Jul 192227.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 194752.4AppointedBishop of Trapani, Italy
28 Dec 194752.5Ordained BishopBishop of Trapani, Italy
21 Jul 195055.1DiedBishop of Trapani, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Jacolino
Bishop Filippo Jacolino (born , died ) Bishop of Trapani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFavara

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast