Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Piergiorgio Silvano Nesti, C.P. †

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1931Born
8 Sep 195322.5Temporary VowsMember of Congregation of the Passion
30 Aug 195928.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
23 Jul 199362.4AppointedArchbishop of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy
29 Aug 199362.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy
27 Nov 199665.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
10 Jul 200675.3RetiredSecretary of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
13 Dec 200978.8DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

MicroData Summary for Piergiorgio Silvano Nesti
Archbishop Piergiorgio Silvano Nesti C.P. (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarostica, Diocese of Vicenza, Italy
Ordained PriestSantuario di Santa Maria del Sasso, Caravate, Diocese of Como, Italy
Ordained BishopAnnonciation, Cathedral, Camerino, Archdiocese of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,169
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • temp/loc: AM, 1 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Sep 2020

Quantcast