Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime José Villarroel Rodríguez

Bishop of Carúpano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1962 BornPorlamar
30 Jul 199331.2Ordained PriestPriest of Margarita, Venezuela
10 Apr 201047.9AppointedBishop of Carúpano, Venezuela
26 Jun 201048.1Ordained BishopBishop of Carúpano, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Jaime José Villarroel Rodríguez:
Bishop Jaime José Villarroel Rodríguez (born ) Bishop of Carúpano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Carúpano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,663

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013